MD HB1121 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System in the Maryland Department of Health to provide a statewide system through which health care providers can identify and access available inpatient and outpatient mental health and substance use services for patients in a certain manner; requiring the Department to develop and implement the Registry and Referral System in collaboration with the State-designated Health Information Exchange, subject to the availability of funds; etc.
Title
Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {186482/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Data
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 5 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |