MD HB1122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a psychiatric nurse practitioner to serve as a medical director of a certain outpatient mental health center, including through telehealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {373323/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {736987/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1122&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1122f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1122t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1122e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_481_hb1122e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1122_73698701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1122_37332301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1122.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1122_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0698.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1122_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1332.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback