MD HB1122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding public institutions of higher education from certain provisions of law governing protection of information by government agencies; requiring public institutions of higher education to review and designate certain systems as systems of record based on certain criteria and to develop and adopt a certain privacy governance program to govern each system of record; requiring public institutions of higher education to develop and adopt a certain information security and risk management program for certain purposes; etc.
Title
State Government – Protection of Personally Identifiable Information – Public Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 429 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {886489/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-02-10 | House | Reassigned to Health and Government Operations Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB588 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Communications
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Federal Government
Higher Education
Identification
Industry and Technology
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Names
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
State Documents
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Agents and Brokers
Communications
Contracts
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Federal Government
Higher Education
Identification
Industry and Technology
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Names
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
State Documents
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 10 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |