MD HB1124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide certain units with training on the preparation of certain economic analyses; requiring a certain promulgating unit to establish an electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation; requiring certain notification when a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation is posted; repealing provisions of law relating to the Advisory Council on the Impact of Regulations on Small Businesses; etc.
Title
State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212 |
2019-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {806182/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Certifications
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Examinations
Governor
Health
Industry and Technology
internet
Job Training
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Budget and Management, Department of
Certifications
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Examinations
Governor
Health
Industry and Technology
internet
Job Training
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Small Business
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials