MD HB113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $400,000 per individual claim and $800,000 per total claims the limits on liability of a local government for claims under the Local Government Tort Claims Act that arise from the same occurrence; altering the period of time from 180 days to 1 year after the injury during which a specified notice of a claim under the Local Government Tort Claims Act must be provided; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirements and Limits on Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-45) (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ferguson) {103829/1 Rejected (21-26) (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-19) (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ferguson) {103829/1 Rejected (21-26) (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-19) (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-45) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | Delegates Rosenberg, Dumais, and Parrott |
2015-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {103829/1 Rejected (21-26) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-19) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {788978/1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-45) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {462718/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Counties
Damages
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Statutes of Limitation
Torts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Counties
Damages
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Statutes of Limitation
Torts