MD HB113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $3,600,000 in the annual State budget for Baltimore City to be used only to provide grants to community-based organizations to implement Safe Streets Initiatives in Baltimore City; requiring that the funds be used to supplement, and not supplant, funds otherwise available; requiring that the Mayor of Baltimore City report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31 each year on the effectiveness and status of Safe Streets Initiatives and a certain summary of the grants awarded; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City Safe Streets Initiatives - Funding (The Tyrone Ray Safe Streets Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-13) |
2018-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Floor Amendment {163926/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {324366/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Community Facilities and Services
Emergency Bills
Grants
Public Safety
Reports
Safety
Baltimore City
Community Facilities and Services
Emergency Bills
Grants
Public Safety
Reports
Safety