MD HB1135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on behalf of certain sponsors, to submit to the U.S. Department of Agriculture certain waivers relating to the federal Summer Food Service Program; requiring the Department to prepare and submit certain waiver requests in accordance with certain guidelines; and requiring the Department to apply to renew certain waivers under certain circumstances.
Title
State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB828 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Agriculture
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Food
Rules and Regulations
Time
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Food
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1135?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1135f.pdf |