MD HB1137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to study and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes needed to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students; and requiring, by December 31, 2019, the Department to submit its recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education and the General Assembly.
Title
Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students – Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {845668/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Education
Education, State Department of
Home Schooling
Hospitals
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Students
Sunset
Counselors
Education
Education, State Department of
Home Schooling
Hospitals
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Students
Sunset