MD HB1142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the failure of law enforcement to notify a certain individual that the individual is being recorded shall not affect the admissibility of a certain recording.
Title
Interception of Oral Communication – Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-2) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-2) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458770/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {702615/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Communications
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Safety
Recordings
Video
Communications
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Notices
Public Safety
Recordings
Video