MD HB1151 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing specified minimum levels of required security for commercial motor vehicles in conformance with federal regulations; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt specified regulations consistent with specified federal regulations; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial Motor Vehicles - Minimum Security Requirements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Buses
Federal Government
For-Hire Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Rules and Regulations
Trucks
Federal Government
For-Hire Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Rules and Regulations
Trucks