MD HB1152 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public school to notify a student's parent or legal guardian when there is a low balance in the student's meal account and before the student accrues unpaid meal debt; prohibiting a public school from communicating about unpaid meal debt directly with a student or in any way that embarrasses or humiliates the student; prohibiting a public school from taking certain actions in response to a student's unpaid meal debt; requiring certain notice about the application process and requirements for certain meal programs; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Food
Health
Human Rights
Language
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Counties
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Food
Health
Human Rights
Language
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students