MD HB1154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain warning on a citation issued for a violation recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, or a work zone speed control system to state that a person alleged to be liable must pay the civil penalty or contest liability within 60 days after the date of issuance of the citation in order to avoid an automatic admission of liability.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems, Speed Monitoring Systems, and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Citation Responses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-3) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {420912/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Citations
Communications
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Citations
Communications
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |