MD HB116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring local correctional facilities to conduct an assessment of the mental health and substance use status of each inmate using evidence-based screenings and assessments to determine if a certain diagnosis is appropriate and if medication-assisted treatment for opioid addiction is appropriate; requiring each local correctional facility to make available at least one formulation of each FDA-approved full opioid agonist, partial opioid agonist, and long-acting opioid antagonist used for the treatment of opioid use disorders; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Correctional Services - Opioid Use Disorder Examinations and Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (137-3)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {217672/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-3)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {812711/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-01-25HouseHearing canceled (Judiciary)
2019-01-18HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0116&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0116f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0116t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0116e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_532_hb0116e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0116_81271101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0116_21767201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0116.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0116_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0116_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0755.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0116_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1147.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1422.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback