MD HB1165 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a government agent from requesting information about immigration or citizenship status of a person or a person's family members or acquaintances; prohibiting a government agent from coercing information or action from a person by using certain information; prohibiting a government agent from detaining or questioning a person based on a certain immigration or citizenship status of the person or any other person; authorizing a person to use a certain legal remedy under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-48) (Y: 92 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) (Y: 40 N: 92 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) (Y: 40 N: 92 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-48) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) |
2019-03-16 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {942217/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Counties - Generally
Court Costs
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Higher Education
Hospitals
Human Services, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Counties - Generally
Court Costs
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Higher Education
Hospitals
Human Services, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials