MD HB1166 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Howard County to impose, by law, a fee on certain retail establishments for the use of disposable bags as part of a retail sale of products; limiting the amount of the fee to not more than 5 cents for each disposable bag used; defining "disposable bag" as a plastic bag provided by a store to a customer at the point of sale; requiring the county to use certain revenue only for a certain environmental purpose or the implementation, administration, and enforcement of the fee; etc.
Title
Howard County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags Ho. Co. 04-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-10) (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-38) (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-38) (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |