MD HB1169 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for payments received by a claimant for noneconomic damages as a result of specified claims of unlawful discrimination, other than amounts received for lost pay or punitive damages; defining specified terms; applying the Act to tax years after 2012; etc.
Title
Civil Rights Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |