MD HB1169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a program to control the spread of black flies in the State; requiring that the program be implemented initially on specified property in Washington County; requiring the Department, in conjunction with the Department of Entomology in the University of Maryland, to conduct the program in a specified manner; authorizing the Department to accept, use, or expend any aid, gift, or grant made available from any private or public source to implement the program; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Gifts
Grants
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Pest Control
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Washington County
Grants
Insects
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuisances
Pest Control
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Washington County