MD HB1169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on ways Western Maryland counties, Southern Maryland counties, Eastern Shore counties, and Frederick, Carroll, and Harford counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve communications services and accessibility in the specified counties; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 30, 2017; etc.
Title
Connecting Rural Maryland Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-31 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {143599/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utility Regulation
Communications
Counties
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utility Regulation