MD HB1169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City; authorizing the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; authorizing a criminal investigator designated as a peace officer to arrest a certain person and service a warrant, summons or subpoena in Baltimore city; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {332018/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Police Training Commission
State's Attorneys
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Police Training Commission
State's Attorneys