MD HB117 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a business, credit card processor, and vendor to take reasonable care to protect against unauthorized access to personal information connected to credit and debit cards in accordance with certain provisions of law; establishing that a business, credit card processor, or vendor is liable to a certain financial institution for certain reimbursement under certain circumstances; providing that a business, credit card processor, or vendor is not liable to a certain financial institution under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-09 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Civil Actions
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Credit
Cybersecurity
Damages
Data
Disclosure
Equipment
Negligence
Notices
Privacy
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Credit
Cybersecurity
Damages
Data
Disclosure
Equipment
Negligence
Notices
Privacy
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 3501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 3504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 3504.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |