MD HB1172 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified images of an emergency vehicle recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system, a speed monitoring system, or a work zone speed control system may not be the basis for a civil penalty or the issuance of a citation under specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Red Light and Speed Monitoring Systems - Emergency Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Citations
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Rescue Squads
Traffic Regulation
Citations
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Recordings
Rescue Squads
Traffic Regulation
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1172.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1172f.pdf |