MD HB1172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a misdemeanor for a retail alcoholic beverages licensee to sell alcoholic beverages by means of a self-scanning cash register or a specified other automated system that may be operated on a self-service basis by a customer; and specifying penalties.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences