MD HB1172 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person to be licensed by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene before the person may provide services to an individual with a developmental disability or a recipient of individual support services; repealing the authority of the Developmental Disabilities Administration to license specified persons to provide specified services; authorizing the Department to impose sanctions, including a civil money penalty not to exceed $5,000, for failure by a licensee to substantially comply with specified laws, regulations, and rules; etc.
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m. |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {576687/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Assisted Living
Civil Actions
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Discipline
Fines
Group Homes
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Home Care Services
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Vocational Rehabilitation
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Assisted Living
Civil Actions
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Discipline
Fines
Group Homes
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Home Care Services
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Vocational Rehabilitation