MD HB1172 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to develop and make available a standardized form for a BSL-3 laboratory for specified purposes; requiring the laboratories to report specified information to the Department on or before September 30, 2018, and on or before September 30 each subsequent year; requiring the Department to report, on or before December 31, 2018, and on or before December 31 each subsequent year, the number and location of the laboratories, in total and by local jurisdiction, to specified State officials; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Disclosure
General Assembly
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Maps and Charts
Medical Research
Names
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Safety
General Assembly
Governor
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Laboratories
Maps and Charts
Medical Research
Names
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Health
Reports
Safety