MD HB1172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Regional Additive Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland to be the Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland; renaming the fund to be the Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland Fund; expanding the purposes of the Partnership to include greater apprenticeship opportunities in advanced manufacturing; requiring the Partnership to report annually on its progress by October 1 to Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFloor Amendment {923222/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {967871/1 Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {673624/1 (Delegate Johnson) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Johnson) Adopted
2019-03-08HouseSpecial Order until 03/12 (Delegate Johnson) Adopted
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {345867/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1172&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1172f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1172t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1172_34586701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1172_67362401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1172_92322201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1172_96787101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1172.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1172_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0533.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1172_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0969.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback