MD HB1173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to establish a meal charge policy that addresses payment for meals, unpaid meal debt, prohibition of stigmatizing action, and other issues related to the administration of school meal programs and management of payments for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education to create and maintain a database of the county board meal charge policies, publish the policies on its website, and report to the General Assembly on certain matters by December 1, 2020 and 2021; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB760 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Debt Collection
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Food
Job Training
Labeling
Language
Literacy
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Counties
Debt Collection
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Food
Job Training
Labeling
Language
Literacy
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1173?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1173f.pdf |