MD HB1183 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to treatment for the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-13) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {223928/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (35-101) (Y: 36 N: 102 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (123-13)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {223928/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (35-101)
2019-03-14HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback