MD HB1188 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a child who is a juvenile placed in the custody of certain entities from being disenrolled from public school until the disposition of the child's juvenile case; requiring the public school in which the child who is a juvenile is enrolled to provide the State Department of Education with certain educational materials; requiring the Department in consultation with county boards of education to develop and implement a procedure to transfer to certain entities a copy of certain educational records; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Enrollment Location - Continuity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {965564/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Counties
Discipline
Education
Foresters
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Students
Discipline
Education
Foresters
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Public Schools
Students