MD HB119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War; authorizing the Commission to raise funds for its operation; requiring the Commission, in consultation with certain persons, to conduct research to advance the documentation of African American patriots in the American Revolutionary War; requiring the Commission to develop a plan to commemorate Maryland African America patriots at certain sites by the placement of statues, landmarks plaques, or historical markers; etc.
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Archives
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Libraries
Minorities
Monuments and Memorials
Museums
Places of Worship
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Archives
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Federal Government
General Services, Department of
Historical Matters
Libraries
Minorities
Monuments and Memorials
Museums
Places of Worship
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0119?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0119f.pdf |