MD HB1196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Critical Area Commission for the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays to adopt regulations to exempt from certain buffer establishment and buffer management plan requirements a lot or parcel for which an applicant applies for a certain subdivision approval if the lot or parcel has a dwelling unit that was in existence on or before July 1, 2010.
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Buffer Establishment and Buffer Management Plan - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Easements
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Housing
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Rules and Regulations
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Easements
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Housing
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Rules and Regulations