MD HB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain coverage and reimbursement requirements for psychiatric health care services delivered through telemedicine under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide coverage of and reimbursement for certain psychiatric health care services that are delivered through telepsychiatry; deeming a psychiatric health care service provided through telepsychiatry to be equivalent to a certain psychiatric health care service for a certain purpose; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance - Telepsychiatry - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 3:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Communications
Data
Electronic Government
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Data
Electronic Government
Examinations
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
internet
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Open Government
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones