MD HB1205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that public and certain nonpublic schools provide instruction on the humane treatment and protection of companion, domestic, and wild animals; requiring a school that keeps a certain animal on the premises to provide an appropriate living space for the animal that meets certain standards; prohibiting an individual from feeding a live animal to another animal under certain circumstances; and requiring that an individual who violates a certain provision of law is guilty of a certain crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary and Secondary Education - Animal Welfare - Instruction, Living Space, and Penalty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2019-03-05HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback