MD HB1209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified indemnity mortgage transactions from the recordation tax; making indemnity mortgage transactions subject to recordation tax after a specified date; authorizing a specified calculation or allocation of recordation tax on indemnity mortgage transactions; altering the transaction amount that is subject to the recordation tax for supplemental instruments of writing; making specified refinancing instruments exempt from the recordation tax; altering the definition of "supplemental instrument of writing"; etc.
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {115661/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |