MD HB1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; authorizing the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to hire, as provided in the State budget, certain individuals for the Technical Assistance Center; requiring and authorizing the Technical Assistance Center to take certain actions; establishing the Collaborative Planning and Implementation Committee for the Technical Assistance Center; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Technical Assistance Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2019-03-18 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {162211/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Emergencies
Grants
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
State Employees
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Emergencies
Grants
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
State Employees