MD HB1210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB217
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1210 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
SB146 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-10 - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
SB146 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-10 - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income
Cannabis Production
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1210?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1210f.pdf |