MD HB1212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment, the Department of Transportation, and the State Highway Administration from holding a certain public hearing on a certain permit or issuing a certain permit unless a certain public hearing is held; requiring the public hearing to be located within 10 miles of the site for which a permit is being sought; and requiring certain State agencies and local jurisdictions to attend the public hearing and be available to answer certain questions.
Title
Department of the Environment, Department of Transportation, and State Highway Administration - Permits With Impact Studies - Hearings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Building Permits
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Examinations
Hearings
Noise
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Examinations
Hearings
Noise
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 6A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1 | 6A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 1 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |