MD HB1214 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to give due consideration to the effect of a generating station, overhead transmission line, or qualified generator lead line on the preservation of environmental quality and the climate before taking final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity.
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Preservation of Environmental Quality and the Climate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB538 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Public Service Commission
Utility Regulation
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Public Service Commission
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1214?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1214f.pdf |