MD HB1219 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the growth in the assessable base of real property located in specified designated development districts may not be treated as taxable real property for purposes of calculating the payment of State aid to education or other payments to counties or municipal corporations; applying the Act to the calculation of payments of State aid for fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2011; etc.
Title
Real Property - Tax Increment Financing - Effect on State Aid
Sponsors
Del. Justin Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2011-03-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2011-02-18 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Counties
Education
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
State Aid
Zoning and Planning
Education
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
State Aid
Zoning and Planning
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1219.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1219f.pdf |