MD HB1219 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse" in provisions of law relating to children in need of assistance to include an act that involves the sex trafficking of a child by any individual; and defining the terms "sexual molestation or exploitation" and "sex trafficking" in provisions of law relating to children in need of assistance.
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157 |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |