MD HB122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Removing rape and certain sexual offenses from the list of offenses alleged to have been committed by a certain respondent against a certain victim for which a peace order petition may be filed under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "person eligible for relief" for purposes of certain provisions of law to include an individual who alleges the commission of rape or a certain sexual offense or attempted rape or sexual offense in any degree by a certain respondent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-18) (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-21) (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {743827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (36-103) (Y: 37 N: 104 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (117-18)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSenators Washington, Hester, and Carter
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-04HouseDelegates J. Lewis, Shetty, and Lopez
2019-04-04HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-04HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-04HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {388470/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-27SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (114-21)
2019-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-22HouseFloor Amendment {743827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Rejected (36-103)
2019-02-21HouseSpecial Order until 02/22 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
2019-02-20HouseSpecial Order until 02/21 (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {972813/2 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0122&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0122f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0122t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_97281302.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_74382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_38847001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_96322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_23372501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0122.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0122_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0121.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0207.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0122_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1047.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0122_23372501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1571.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback