MD HB1222 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, for fiscal 2021, the Department of Budget and Management to create two new State positions for the State Board of Elections for the purpose of employing staff to enforce campaign finance violations and ensure compliance with campaign finance law.
Title
State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Enforcement and Compliance - New State Positions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-34) |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
State Employees
State Government - Personnel