MD HB1226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each local workforce development board to recruit employers to provide youth apprenticeships, registered apprenticeships, and job opportunities for certain students and graduates; requiring each local workforce development board to match high school students with youth apprenticeships, registered apprenticeships, and job opportunities; requiring the State and certain local governing bodies, beginning in fiscal year 2021, to distribute a certain amount of funding to local workforce development boards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Career Centers for 21st-Century Jobs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback