MD HB1229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny, cancel, suspend, or revoke the commercial motor vehicle registration of a vehicle if the motor carrier responsible for the safety of the vehicle is subject to an out-of-service order, under specified provisions of law, or other federal operating authority sanctions or determinations; requiring that a denial, cancellation, suspension, or revocation continue until the out-of-service order or other sanctions have been lifted and the carrier is allowed to resume operations; etc.
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Federal Government
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Safety
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Safety
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration