MD HB1229 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a specified share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will; providing that a surviving spouse may take a specified elective share amount of a specified augmented estate; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a specified elective share amount is payable; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-3) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-3) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {656689/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Contracts
Disabilities
Divorce
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Minors
Notices
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Contracts
Disabilities
Divorce
Estate Tax
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Jurisdiction
Marriage
Minors
Notices
Orphans' Court
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Time