MD HB1236 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in racial profiling; establishing specified penalties for a law enforcement officer who engages in racial profiling; requiring each law enforcement agency to establish specified administrative complaint procedures; requiring the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General to establish procedures for receiving and maintaining a record of complaints alleging racial profiling by a law enforcement officer; etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Racial Profiling - Prohibited
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Del. Tom Hucker [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Arrests
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Discrimination
Forms
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Records
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Arrests
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Discrimination
Forms
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Records
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1236.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1236f.pdf |