MD HB1236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring State units that collect specified demographic data to use separate collection categories for specified categories of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders; requiring specified State units to use additional specified separate collection categories; requiring specified units to make specified data available to the public and to post specified data on the State unit's Web site beginning on July 1, 2013, and yearly thereafter; etc.
Title
State Government - Demographic Data Collection - Asian Americans and Pacific
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Rights Commission
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Privacy
Public Information
Reports
Civil Rights Commission
Electronic Government
Ethnic Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Privacy
Public Information
Reports
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1236.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1236f.pdf |