MD HB1236 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the consideration used to calculate the recordation and State and county transfer tax on specified transactions for which a controlling interest is conveyed.
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {929730/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {635269/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Housing
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Housing
Real Property
Recordation
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax