MD HB1236 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified individuals who have personal knowledge of the death of another individual or who have personally discovered a body to provide specified notice of the death within 4 hours to a specified law enforcement officer; prohibiting an individual from burying or disposing of a body except in a specified manner; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both, for violation of the Act.
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Michael McDermott [R] |
Sen. Andrew Serafini [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {836680/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Cemeteries
Cremation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Emergencies
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Public Health
Cremation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Emergencies
Interstate Affairs
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Public Health