MD HB1236 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly importing, manufacturing, distributing, selling, or offering for sale a counterfeit airbag or a nonfunctional airbag; prohibiting a person from knowingly installing a counterfeit airbag or a nonfunctional airbag in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from knowingly selling or installing a device that causes the vehicle diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the airbag is functional when a counterfeit airbag, a nonfunctional airbag, or no airbag is installed; etc.
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {768775/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-17 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation and Judiciary |
2016-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Fines
Fraud
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections