MD HB1236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain employers to have a certificate of pay equity compliance issued by the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; requiring a custodian of public records to deny the inspection of the part of a public record that contains certain data related to equal pay certificates; prohibiting certain units from entering into a certain contract unless a certain employer has a certain certificate; etc.
Title
State Contracts - Certification of Pay Equity Compliance - Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Certifications
Communications
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Gender
Inspections
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Communications
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Gender
Inspections
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time